Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1423
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1423
Title:Paul E. Cooper, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 14, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0282)
   Decision Date:February 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maryann Nowak McGuire
    Counsel of Record
Department of Navy, Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris ST. SE
Washington, DC 20374

maryann.n.mcguire@navy.mil
2026857292
Party name: Paul Cooper
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543