Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1269
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1269
Title:Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank
Docketed:April 3, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1281)
   Decision Date:January 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to June 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 6, 2019.
Apr 26 2019Response of Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc. to motion not accepted for filing. (May 13, 2019 - paper version not received)
May 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2019Brief of respondent Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 06 2019Reply of petitioner Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 09 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 30, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 17, 2019.
Aug 30 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief of petitioner Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 3, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Brief of respondent Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit...
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Nov 14 2019Reply of petitioner Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mitchell Pearsall Reich
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20004

mitchell.reich@hoganlovells.com
2026375833
Party name: Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc.
Neal Kumar KatyalHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Simon E. Rodriguez, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of United Western Bancorp, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank
Other
Peter John Connors
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

pconnors@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543