Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1254
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1254
Title:Jeremiah L. King, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0288)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dustin Joseph Weisman
    Counsel of Record
United States Air Force
1500 West Perimeter Road, Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD 20762

Dustin.j.weisman.mil@mail.mil
240-612-4770
Party name: Jeremiah King
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543