Feb 04 2019 | Application (18A801) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 17, 2019 to April 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentOtherOther |
Feb 06 2019 | Application (18A801) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2019. |
| |
Mar 19 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 09 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 10 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2019. |
| |
May 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2019 to June 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 21, 2019. |
| |
Jun 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2019 to August 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 07 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 2, 2019. |
| |
Jul 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 2, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Aug 01 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2019. |
| |
Oct 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 1, 2019. |
| |
Oct 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019. |
| |
Dec 06 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. VIDED |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
Dec 23 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
| |
Dec 23 2019 | Reply of petitioner Christopher Vialva filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |