Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1171
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1171
Title:Comcast Corporation, Petitioner
v.
National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Docketed:March 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56479)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief of respondents National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Apr 29 2019Reply of petitioner Comcast Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 15 2019Rescheduled.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jun 18 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 26 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 23, 2019.
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 13, 2019.
Aug 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Comcast Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Aug 08 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 08 2019Brief of petitioner Comcast Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. Central District of California is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Issues4Life Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2019Brief of respondents National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Law & History Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Torts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor W. Burlette Carter filed. (Distributed).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Employment Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: Comcast Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Other
Willieta Burlette Carter
    Counsel of Record
c/o George Washington Univ. Law School (Prof. Emerita)
George Washington University
2000 H. St. N.W.
Washington, DC 20052

bcarter@law.gwu.edu
2029945155
Party name: Professor W. Burlette Carter
Eugene Roy Fidell
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

efidell@feldesmantucker.com
2022568675
Party name: Law & History Professors
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
UCI Law Civil Rights Litigation Clinic
401 E. Peltason
Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92697

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: Torts Scholars
Kristen Adrina Johnson
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St., 5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

kjohnson@naacpldf.org
212-965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Dariely Rodriguez
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

drodriguez@lawyerscommittee.org
2026628600
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 92544

LLDFOjai@cs.com
707-224-6675
Party name: Issues4Life Foundation
Sandra F. Sperino
    Counsel of Record
University of Cincinnati College of Law
2540 Clifton Ave.
Cincinnati, OH 45221

sandra.sperino@uc.edu
513-556-0193
Party name: Employment Law Professors
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Rae Thiesfield Vann
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543