Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1166
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1166
Title:Colton W. Sievers, Petitioner
v.
Nebraska
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-17-518)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Waiver of Nebraska of right to respond not accepted for filing. (April 02, 2019) (Corrected efiling submitted).
Apr 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent Nebraska to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 18 2019Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2019)
May 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2019 to June 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Policing Project at New York University School of Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2019.
May 24 2019Brief of respondent Nebraska in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 30 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2019Reply of petitioner Colton Sievers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Orin S. Kerr
    Counsel of Record
699 Exposition Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90089

orin@orinkerr.com
626 657 0253
Party name: Colton Sievers
Attorneys for Respondent
Austin Nicholas Relph
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

austin.relph@nebraska.gov
4024711805
Party name: Nebraska
Other
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Policing Project at New York University School of Law, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543