Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1164
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1164
Title:In Re Alan Giordani, Petitioner
Docketed:March 7, 2019
Linked with 18A1062
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2019Petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Application (18A1062) for a stay, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Apr 18 2019Application (18A1062) denied by Justice Ginsburg.
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 23 2019Application (18A1062) refiled and submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Apr 23 2019Application (18A1062) referred to the Court.
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 13 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Giordani82-14 60th Road
Middle Village, NY 11379

718-896-7077
Party name: In Re Alan Giordani

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543