Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1151
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1151
Title:St. Augustine School, et al., Petitioners
v.
Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in Her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2333)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 24, 2019.
Apr 05 2019Brief of respondent Friess Lake School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Brief of respondents Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Reply of petitioners St. Augustine School, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jun 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Espinoza v. Montana Dept. of Revenue, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).
Aug 03 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn Ave.
Ste. 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: St. Augustine School, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kristin Renee Pierre
    Counsel of Record
Axley Brynelson, LLP
2 E. Mifflin Street, Suite 200
Madison, WI 53703

kpierre@axley.com
6082836719
Party name: Friess Lake School District
Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 West Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

vandermeusejl@doj.state.wi.us
608-266-7741
Party name: Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543