Docket for 18-1140
|
Mar 01 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 06 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Jill Sikkelee to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 12 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Avco Corporation. | | Blanket Consent | Mar 19 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jill Sikkelee | | Blanket Consent | Mar 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. | | | Mar 21 2019 | Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2019) | | | Apr 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019. | | | Apr 19 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Experimental Aircraft Association, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Garmin International, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Aerospace Industries Association of America, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Airbus Americas, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of General Aviation Manufacturers Association filed. (To Be Recovered) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 22 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 22 2019 | Brief of respondent Jill Sikkelee in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 30 2019 | Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed. | | Main Document | Jun 04 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019. | | | Jun 04 2019 | Reply of petitioner Avco Corporation filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 24 2019 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | | Dec 09 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 23 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. | | | Dec 23 2019 | Supplemental brief of respondent Jill Sikkelee filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 23 2019 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Avco Corporation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|