Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1120
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1120
Title:Theresa Riffey, et al., Petitioners
v.
J. B. Pritzker, Governor of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:February 27, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3487)
   Decision Date:December 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Waiver of right of respondent Governor J.B. Pritzker, in his Official Capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019Waiver of right of respondents SEIU Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 09 2019Response Requested. (Due May 9, 2019)
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2019, for all respondents.
May 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Mark Janus and the Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Brief of respondents SEIU Healthcare Illinois, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Brief of respondent JB Pritzker in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioners Theresa Riffey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Theresa Riffey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: SEIU Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street
12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: JB Pritzker
Frank Henry BieszczatOffice of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

fbieszczat@atg.state.il.us
312-814-2234
Party name: Governor J.B. Pritzker, in his Official Capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois, et al.
Other
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center and Mark Janus

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543