Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-112
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-112
Title:Vance D. Day, Judge, Circuit Court of Oregon, Third Judicial District, Petitioner
v.
Oregon Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability
Docketed:July 25, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(S063844)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2018Brief of respondent Oregon Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Reply of petitioner The Honorable Vance Day filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 09 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: The Honorable Vance Day
Attorneys for Respondent
Timothy R. Volpert
    Counsel of Record
Tim Volpert PC
610 SW Alder St.
Suite 415
Portland, OR 97205

tim@timvolpertlaw.com
5037039054
Party name: Oregon Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability
Other
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund
P.O. Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
858-759-9930
Party name: Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543