Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-107
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-107
Title:R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 24, 2018
Linked with 17A1267
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2424)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2018Application (17A1267) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2018 to August 3, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2018Application (17A1267) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 3, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 23, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Aug 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018, for all respondents.
Aug 15 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Nebraska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2018Letter of September 13, 2018 from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2018The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018, for all respondents.
Oct 24 2018Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 24 2018Brief of respondent Aimee Stephens in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Reply of petitioner R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 26 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 03 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 15 2019Letter of February 13, 2019 from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether Title VII prohibits discrimination against transgender people based on (1) their status as transgender or (2) sex stereotyping under Price Waterhouse v. Hopkins, 490 U. S. 228 (1989).
May 09 2019Briefing proposal from the parties in Nos. 17-1618, 17-1623, and 18-107 filed. VIDED.
Main Document
May 10 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc.
Blanket Consent
May 13 2019Petitioner in No. 17-1618, respondents in No. 17-1623, and respondent Aimee Stephens in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(v), on or before Wednesday, June 26, 2019. Respondent in No. 17-1618, petitioners in No. 17-1623, and petitioner and respondent EEOC in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vi), on or before Friday, August 16, 2019. Reply briefs, if any, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vii), shall be filed on or before Monday, September 16, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs shall be filed pursuant to Rule 37.3. VIDED.
May 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Blanket Consent
Jun 05 2019Letter from counsel for respondent Aimee Stephens, petitioner in 17-1618, and respondents in 17-1623, regarding requests for consent to file amicus curiae briefs filed. VIDED
Main Document
Jun 06 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 26 2019Brief of respondent Aimee Stephens filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 8, 2019.
Jul 02 2019Brief amici curiae of The Women’s and Children’s Advocacy Project, Equal Means Equal, and Allies Reaching for Equality filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 02 2019Amicus brief of Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund and 33 Organizations Serving Transgender Individuals submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Employment Discrimination Law Scholars filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Altria Group, Inc. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of William N. Eskridge Jr. and Andrew M. Koppelman filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel R. Bagenstos, Michael C. Dorf, Martin S. Lederman, Leah M. Litman, and Margo Schlanger filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Anti-Discrimination Scholars filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Anti-sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-based Violence Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Brief of Scholars Who Study the Transgender Population filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Legal Aid Society filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Southern Poverty Law Center, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of 206 Businesses filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Modern Military Association of America and Transgender American Veterans Association filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Illinois, New York, et al. filed (also 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Philosophy Professors filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Joinder Letter from Counsel for Intel Corporation of Intel Corporation not accepted for filing. (July 05, 2019)
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of InterACT: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Business Organizations filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Trevor Project, PFLAG, and Family Equality filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Muslim Bar Association of New York, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Medical Association, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Law & History Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Mayors filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National LGBT Bar Association, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Corpus-Linguistics Scholars Professors Brian Slocum, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Presiding Bishop and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Branch Officials and Leaders, et al. filed (alos in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Women CEOs and Other C-Suite Executives filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Amicus brief of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted).
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. filed (July 10, 2019); (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Transgender Law Center, Center for Constitutional Rights, and 44 Other Non-Profit and Grassroots Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Advcocacy Organizations filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Walter Dellinger, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Women's Law Center filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Advocacy Organizations filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Impact Fund, et al. filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Amicus brief of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, the Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, and 57 Civil Rights Organizations submitted.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Equality filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Members of the Legal Profession filed (also in 17-1618 & 17-1623). VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Amicus brief of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Members of the Legal Profession submitted.
OtherOtherOtherMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jcampbell@ADFlegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Equal Opportunity Employment Commission
John A. Knight
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
150 N. Michigan Ave.
Ste. 600
Chicago, IL 60601

jaknight@aclu.org
312-201-9740
Party name: Aimee Stephens
Other
David T. Bydalek
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2115 State Capitol Building
Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

dave.bydalek@nebraska.gov
402-471-3812
Party name: States of Nebraska, et al.
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
1109 C. Street, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave W
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
703-356-5070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
Todd Steven Anten
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010

toddanten@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: 206 Businesses
Dan L. Bagatell
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
3 Weatherby Road
Hanover, NH 03755

dbagatell@perkinscoie.com
6023518250
Party name: Intel Corporation
Peter T. Barbur
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

pbarbur@cravath.com
(212) 474-1000
Party name: Members of Congress
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-679-5257
Party name: Business Organizations
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-421-0837
Party name: Georgia Equality
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20001

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Legal Aid Society
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
David Ryan Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

drcarpenter@sidley.com
(213) 896-6000
Party name: Brief of Scholars Who Study the Transgender Population
Barbara Jane ChisholmAltshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

bchisholm@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: Service Employees International Union, et al.
Margaret A. Costello
    Counsel of Record
University of Detroit Mercy School of Law
651 East Jefferson Avenue
Detroit, MI 48226-4386

costelma@udmercy.edu
3135969854
Party name: Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Members of the Legal Profession
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Allen and Overy LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

andrewrhys.davies@allenovery.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Corpus-Linguistics Scholars Professors Brian Slocum, et al.
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

wdellinger@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Anti-sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-based Violence Organizations
Douglas Charles Dreier
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ddreier@wileyrein.com
2027194988
Party name: The Trevor Project, PFLAG, and Family Equality
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Kenneth B. Mehlman, et al.
William N. Eskridge Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

william.eskridge@yale.edu
(203) 432-4992
Party name: William N. Eskridge Jr. and Andrew M. Koppelman
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Suzanne Beth Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

sgoldberg@columbia.edu
212-854-0411
Party name: Women CEOs and Other C-Suite Executives
Lauren Rosenblum Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

lgoldman@mayerbrown.com
(212) 506-2500
Party name: Altria Group, Inc.
Danielle Luce Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
200 N. Main Street, 7th Fl.
Los Angeles, CA 90012

danielle.goldstein@lacity.org
2139781868
Party name: Local Governments and Mayors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars
Lisa Hogan
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th St. Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

lhogan@bhfs.com
303-223-1100
Party name: Philosophy Professors
Jonah Moses Knobler
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jknobler@pbwt.com
2123362134
Party name: Interact: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al.
Craig Joseph Konnoth
    Counsel of Record
425 Wolf Law Building, 401 UCB
Boulder, CO 80309-0401

303-735-6397
Party name: Law & History Professors
Erica Courtney Lai
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
2001 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

elai@cohengresser.com
2028512073
Party name: National Women's Law Center
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: National Education Association, et al.
Julia Renee Lissner
    Counsel of Record
Akerman LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
47th Floor
Chicago, IL 60606

julia.lissner@akerman.com
3126345700
Party name: Transgender Law Center, Center for Constitutional Rights, and 44 Other Non-Profit and Grassroots Organizations
Karen Lee Loewy
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal
120 Wall Street, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10005-3919

kloewy@lambdalegal.org
212-809-8585
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Adeel Abdullah Mangi
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

aamangi@pbwt.com
(212) 36-2000
Party name: Muslim Bar Association of New York, et al.
Joshua Adam MatzKaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Walter Dellinger, et al.
Jeffrey Allen McIntyre
    Counsel of Record
HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP
33 East Main Street
Suite 300
Madison, WI 53703

jeffrey.mcintyre@huschblackwell.com
608-255-4440
Party name: Wisconsin Advocacy Organizations
James Leon Moore III
    Counsel of Record
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

james.moore@probonolaw.com
202-371-7337
Party name: Modern Military Association of America and Transgender American Veterans Association
Wendy J. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
New Englland School of Law
154 Stuart Street
Boston, MA 02478

Wmurphy@nesl.edu
617-422-7410
Party name: The Women’s and Children’s Advocacy Project, Equal Means Equal, and Allies Reaching for Equality
Lindsay Polastri Nako
    Counsel of Record
Impact Fund
125 University Ave., Suite 102
Berkeley, CA 94710-1616

lnako@impactfund.org
5108453473
Party name: Impact Fund, et al.
Mitchell Pearsall Reich
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20004

mitchell.reich@hoganlovells.com
2026375833
Party name: Anti-Discrimination Scholars
Sanford Jay Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP
101 Mission Street, Sixth Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

srosen@rbgg.com
415-433-6830
Party name: National LGBT Bar Association, et al.
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 W 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
2125063679
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, the Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, and 57 Civil Rights Organizations
Sasha Minh Samberg-Champion
    Counsel of Record
Relman, Dane & Colfax
1225 19th St., NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036-2456

ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
2027281888
Party name: Employment Discrimination Law Scholars
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al.
Chanakya Arjun Sethi
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz LLP
130 W 42nd St
Suite 1402
New York, NY 10036

csethi@wilkinsonwalsh.com
929-264-7758
Party name: Historians
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: The Southern Poverty Law Center, et al.
Jeffrey S. Trachtman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
212 715 9175
Party name: The Presiding Bishop and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of Illinois, New York, et al.
Scott Block Wilkens
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

swilkens@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The American Medical Association, et al.
Evan Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

evan@freedomtomarry.org
212-768-6700
Party name: Former Executive Branch Officials and Leaders, et al.
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

dhwoofter@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Professors Samuel R. Bagenstos, Michael C. Dorf, Martin S. Lederman, Leah M. Litman, and Margo Schlanger
Howard Scott Zelbo
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza, 44th Floor
New York, NY 10006

hzelbo@cgsh.com
212-225-2452
Party name: Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund and 33 Organizations Serving Transgender Individuals

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543