Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A909
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A909
Title:Michael C. Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, et al., Applicants
v.
League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:February 27, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(J-1-2018)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2018Application (17A909) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 28 2018Response to application (17A909) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, March 5, by 3 p.m. ET.
Mar 05 2018Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Response to application from respondents Governor Thomas W. Wolf, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Response to application from respondent Lieutenant Governor Michael J. Stack, III filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Republican Party of Pennsylvania.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Response to application from respondents Brian McCann, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Dick Thornburgh, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2018Reply of applicants Michael C. Turzai, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Application (17A909) referred to the Court.
Mar 19 2018Application (17A909) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Michael C. Turzai, in his capacity as Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, and Joseph B. Scarnati III, in his capacity as Pennsylvania Senate President Pro Tempore
Attorneys for Respondents
Clifford Benjamin Levine
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Grigsby, P.C.
625 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

clevine@cohenlaw.com
412-297-4998
Party name: Michael J. Stack III
Rebecca Lee Warren
    Counsel of Record
Obermayer, Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
1500 Market Street Suite 3400
Philadelphia, PA 19102

rebecca.warren@obermayer.com
2156653026
Party name: Brian McCann et al
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@apks.com
202-942-5891
Party name: League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al.
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Governor Thomas W. Wolf, et al.
Other
David R. Fine
    Counsel of Record
K & L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
18th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

david.fine@klgates.com
(717) 231-4500
Party name: Dick Thornburgh and Bill McCollum
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Joel L. Frank
    Counsel of Record
Lamb McErlane PC
24 E. Market Street
West Chester, PA 19380

jfrank@lambmcerlane.com
610-430-8000
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania
Scott Eric Gessler
    Counsel of Record
Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC
1624 Market Street
Suite 202
Denver, CO 80202

sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com
720-432-5705
Party name: American Civil Rights Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543