Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A859
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A859
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:February 12, 2018
Linked with 17-1272
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Application (17A859) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Response to application (17A859) requested by Justice Alito, due Wednesday, February 21, by 3 p.m. ET.
Feb 21 2018Response to application from respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Reply of applicant Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Application (17A859) referred to the Court.
Mar 02 2018The application (17A859) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, case No. 2:12-cv-572, are stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lewis T. LeClair
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543