Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A745
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A745
Title:Robert A. Rucho, et al., Applicants
v.
Common Cause, et al.
Docketed:January 12, 2018
Linked with 17-1295
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:16-CV-1026 1:16-CV-1164)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2018Application (17A745) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Response to application (17A745) requested by The Chief Justice, due Wednesday, January 17, by noon ET.
Jan 16 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III.
Main Document
Jan 16 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by George Holding, et al.
Main Document
Jan 17 2018Response to application from respondents Common Cause, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Louisiana, et al.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Reply of applicants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Application (17A745) referred to the Court.
Jan 18 2018Application (17A745) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, case Nos. 1:16-CV-1026 and 1:16-CV-1164, entered January 9, 2018, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application for stay.
Jan 23 2018Motion to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for expedited briefing and oral argument schedule filed by appellees Common Cause, et al. and League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2018The motion of appellees to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for an expedited briefing and oral argument schedule is denied. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would grant the motion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Robert A. Rucho, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-421-0837
Party name: Common Cause, et al.
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: League of Women Voters of North Carolina et al.
Other
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Louisiana Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: THE STATES OF LOUISIANA, TEXAS, MICHIGAN, AND SOUTH CAROLINA
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III
Thomas John Josefiak
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Drive
Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

tomj@hvjt.law
(540) 341-8808
Party name: George Holding, Walter B. Jones, Jr., Virginia Foxx, Mark Walker, David Rouzer, Richard Hudson, Robert Pittenger, Patrick T. McHenry, Mark Meadows, and Ted Budd
Scott Eric Gessler
    Counsel of Record
Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC
1624 Market Street
Suite 202
Denver, CO 80202

sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com
720-432-5705
Party name: American Civil Rights Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543