Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A40
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A40
Title:Reece N. Tso, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 6, 2017
Linked with 17-479
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0497/MC)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2017Application (17A40) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 06 2017Application (17A40) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald R. Ostrom
    Counsel of Record
CDR, JAGC, U.S. Navy
U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St., SE
Bldg. 58, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374

donald.r.ostrom@navy.mil
Party name: Reece N. Tso
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

jeffrey.b.wall@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543