Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A360 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
No. 17A360 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al., Applicants
v.
Jeffrey Lynn Borden
Docketed:October 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11536)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2017Application (17A360) to vacate injunction, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 03 2017Response to application from respondent Borden, Jeffrey L. filed.
Oct 04 2017Application (17A360) referred to the Court.
Oct 04 2017Application (17A360) granted by the Court. The application to vacate the injunction entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit on September 29, 2017, presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court, is granted. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application to vacate the injunction.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas R. Govan, Jr.
    Counsel of Record
501 Washington Avenue
P.O. Box 300152
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

tgovan@ago.state.al.us
(334)-242-7300
Party name: Dunn, Comm'r, AL DOC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Anthony Palombi
    Counsel of Record
817 South Court Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

(502)-564-3948
Party name: Borden, Jeffrey L.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543