Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A338
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A338
Title:James W. Richards, IV, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:September 25, 2017
Linked with 17-701
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0727)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Application (17A338) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2017 to November 10, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Sep 28 2017Application (17A338) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 10, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: James W. Richards
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543