Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A1120
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A1120
Title:Michael C. Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, et al., Applicants
v.
League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:April 13, 2018
Linked with 17-1700
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(159 MM 2017)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2018Application (17A1120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2018 to June 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 16 2018Application (17A1120) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 21, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Michael C. Turzai, in his capacity as Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, and Joseph B. Scarnati III, in his capacity as Pennsylvania Senate President Pro Tempore

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543