Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-961
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-961
Title:Theodore H. Frank, et al., Petitioners
v.
Paloma Gaos, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:January 8, 2018
Linked with 18A242
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15858)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 5, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2018, for all respondents.
Feb 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Individual Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2018Brief amici curiae of Attorney General of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief of respondents Paloma Gaos, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Brief of respondent Google LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Reply of petitioners Theodore H. Frank, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition GRANTED.
May 03 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 9, 2018. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2018.
Jul 02 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 09 2018Brief of petitioners Theodore H. Frank, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2018Amicus brief of Cato Institute not accepted for filing. (July 12, 2018)
Jul 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Americans for Prosperity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers for Civil Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Former Professor Roy A. Katriel in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Individual Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute for Policy Research filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2018Amicus brief of American Bar Association not accepted for filing. (July 17, 2018 - Brief does not comply with Rules 33 & 34. To be reprinted.)
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of New Jersey Civil Justice Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amici curiae of David Lowrey, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Attorneys General of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 31, 2018
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondents Paloma Gaos, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondent Google LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed by Former Professor Roy A. Katriel.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Amicus brief of Professor William B. Rubenstein not accepted for filing. (Resubmitted with all required documentation - September 05, 2018)
Sep 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor William B. Rubenstein filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of The Center for Democracy and Technology, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. and Public Citizen Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Oregon, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Legal Aid Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association and TechNet filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2018Amicus brief of National Consumer Law Center, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief to be resubmitted - September 10, 2018)
Sep 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Civil Justice Research Initiative filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of The New York Bar Foundation and The New York State Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2018Opposition of petitioners to motion of Former Professor Roy A. Katriel for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Application (18A242) to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 11 2018Application (18A242) to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit granted in part by The Chief Justice. Petitioners' reply brief on the merits may not exceed 7,000 words.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

tfrank@gmail.com
2023312263
Party name: Theodore H. Frank, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300
3000 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306

dfalk@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2000
Party name: Google LLC
Kassra Powell Nassiri
    Counsel of Record
Nassiri & Jung LLP
47 Kearny Street, Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94108

kass@njfirm.com
415-762-3111
Party name: Paloma Gaos, et al.
Jeffrey Alan LamkenMoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2000
Party name: Paloma Gaos, et al.
Other
Lori B. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Chicago-Kent College of Law
565 West Adams Street
Chicago, IL 60661

landrews@kentlaw.iit.edu
312-906-5359
Party name: Law Professors
John Richard Annand
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jannand@ntlakis.com
202-629-5617
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance
Hilarie Bass
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5109
Party name: American Bar Association
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and Atlantic Legal Foundation
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Joseph E Feibelman
    Counsel of Record
Burch Porter & Johnson, PLLC
130 North Court Avenue
Memphis, TN 38103

jfeibelman@bpjlaw.com
901-524-5109
Party name: New Jersey Civil Justice Institute
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court St NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: States of Oregon, et al.
Roy Arie Katriel
    Counsel of Record
The Katriel Law Firm, P.C.
4660 La Jolla Village Drive
Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92122

rak@katriellaw.com
858-546-4435
Party name: Former Professor Roy A. Katriel
Jeremy Lynn Kidd
    Counsel of Record
Mercer University School of Law
1021 Georgia Ave.
Macon, GA 31207

kidd_j@law.mercer.edu
571-345-6533
Party name: Cato Institute and Americans for Prosperity
David H. Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
650 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

dkramer@wsgr.com
650-493-9300
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry and Technet
Eric Leslie Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC
1101 New York Avenue NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

eric.lewis@lbkmlaw.com
2028338900
Party name: Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC
C.Thomas Ludden
    Counsel of Record
Lipson Neilson P.C.
3910 Telegraph Road, Suite 200
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302

tludden@lipsonneilson.com
248-981-8995
Party name: Manhattan Institute for Policy Research
Christopher May Mason
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
Tower 46
55 West 46th Street
New York, NY 10036-4120

cmason@nixonpeabody.com
212-940-3017
Party name: The New York Bar Foundation and The New York State Bar Association
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett & Cooney, P.C.
38505 Woodward Ave
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
313-983-4801
Party name: Lawyers for Civil Justice
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Antigone Gabriella Peyton
    Counsel of Record
Protorae Law PLLC
1921 Gallows Road
Suite 950
Tysons, VA 22182

apeyton@protoraelaw.com
7037498507
Party name: David Lowrey, Raymond J. Pepperell, Blake Morgan, and Guy Forsyth
Michael E. Rosman
    Counsel of Record
Center For Individual Rights
1100 Connecticut Ave., NW, Suite 625
Washington, DC 20036

rosman@cir-usa.org
2028338400
Party name: Center for Individual Rights
Stuart Todd Rossman
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Law Center
7 Winthrop Square, Fourth Floor
Boston, MA 02110

srossman@nclc.org
617-542-8010
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, et al.
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
William B. Rubenstein
    Counsel of Record
1545 Massachusetts Avenue
AR323
Cambridge, MA 02138

rubenstein@law.harvard.edu
617-496-7320
Party name: Professor William B. Rubenstein
Oramel Horace Skinner
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

o.h.skinner@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Attorney General of Arizona, et al.
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger & Associates, P.C.
13250 Branch View Ln.
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
972-243-5297
Party name: Civil Justice Research Institute
Leslie M.F. Spencer
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
1900 University Avenue, 6th Floor
East Palo Alto, CA 10036

leslie.spencer@ropesgray.com
1-917-836-9379
Party name: The Center for Democracy and Technology, The Electronic Frontier Foundation, and The National Consumers League
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2029442839
Party name: American Association for Justice
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc. and Public Citizen Foundation
Wilber H. Boies
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery, LLP
444 W. Lake St.
Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60606

bboies@mwe.com
3129847686
Party name: Legal Aid Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543