Docket for 17-9564 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 20 2018 | Application (17A1017) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2018 to June 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Mar 28 2018 | Application (17A1017) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 23, 2018. | | | Jun 21 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jul 24 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 07 2018 | Reply of petitioner ETHERIA JACKSON filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 09 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|