Docket for 17-9520 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 10 2018 | Application (17A1099) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2018 to June 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Apr 16 2018 | Application (17A1099) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 21, 2018. | | | Jun 21 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 25, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 24 2018 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOther | Aug 09 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Aug 10 2018 | Reply of petitioner Harry F. Phillips filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|