SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-9409 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-9409 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Gary W. Sutton, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:
June 18, 2018
Linked with 17A1073
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
Case Numbers:
(E2017-01394-CCA-R28-PD)
Decision Date:
September 13, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 18, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 03 2018
Application (17A1073) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 18, 2018 to June 17, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Apr 05 2018
Application (17A1073) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 17, 2018.
Jun 14 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 18, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 18 2018
Brief of respondent State of Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018
Reply of petitioner Gary Sutton filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 02 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Helen Susanne Bales Levi
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee, In
800 S. Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929-9714
Susanne_Bales@fd.org
8656377979
Party name: Gary Sutton
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas White Spangler
Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
nick.spangler@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3486
Party name: State of Tennessee
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##