Docket for 17-94
|
May 05 2017 | Application (16A1091) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2017 to July 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | | May 10 2017 | Application (16A1091) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 17, 2017. | | | Jul 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2017) | | | Aug 10 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2017. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 19, 2017. | | | Sep 22 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2017. | | | Nov 02 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2017. | | | Nov 07 2017 | Brief of respondents Department of State, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Nov 28 2017 | Reply of petitioner Stagg P.C. filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 29 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|