Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9077
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9077
Title:Robert A. Condon, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0392)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Jun 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert A. Condon# 94312
1300 N. Warehouse Road
Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027

(419) 877-0342
Party name: Robert A. Condon
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543