Docket for 17-904
|
Oct 13 2017 | Application (17A408) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Oct 17 2017 | Application (17A408) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 22, 2017. | | | Dec 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 25, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 29 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2018 to February 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Jan 04 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2018. | | | Jan 24 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 25 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Tax Law Professors filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2018 | Brief of respondent Dulles Duty Free, LLC in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 08 2018 | Reply of petitioner County of Loudoun, Virginia filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018. | | | Apr 02 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|