Docket for 17-887
|
Oct 05 2017 | Application (17A386) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2017 to December 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Application (17A386) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 16, 2017. | | | Dec 18 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 17 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 22 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2018 | | | Feb 21 2018 | Brief of respondent Dentrell Brown in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 07 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018. | | | Mar 07 2018 | Reply of petitioner Richard Brown, Warden, Wabash Valley Correctional Facility filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018. | | | Apr 09 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018. | | | Apr 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|