Docket for 17-8491 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 09 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendix | May 16 2018 | Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. filed. | | Main Document | May 30 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018. | | | Jun 12 2018 | Rescheduled. | | | Jun 18 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018. | | | Jun 25 2018 | Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) | | |
|