Docket for 17-842
|
Dec 07 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2018) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 11, 2018 to February 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2018. | | | Feb 12 2018 | Brief of respondent Universal Health Services of Hartgrove, Inc., dba Hartgrove Hospitial in opposition filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Feb 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. | | | Mar 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|