Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-840
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-840
Title:Torie A. Cash, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 12, 2017
Linked with 17A415
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0376/AR)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2017Application (17A415) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 23, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 18 2017Application (17A415) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 22, 2017.
Dec 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Torie A. Cash, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543