Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8344 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8344 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Keith Tharpe, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:April 4, 2018
Linked with 17A767
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
   Case Numbers:(S18W0242)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2018Application (17A767) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2018 to April 1, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018Application (17A767) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 1, 2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2018 to May 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2018.
May 18 2018Brief of respondent Eric Sellers in opposition filed.
Main Document
May 29 2018Reply of petitioner Keith Tharpe filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 12 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian S. Kammer
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
303 Elizabeth St. NE
Atlanta, GA 30307

brian.kammer@garesource.org
404-222-9212
Party name: Keith Tharpe
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
4046947975
Party name: Eric Sellers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543