Docket for 17-8275 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 10 2018 | Application (17A740) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2018 to March 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Jan 15 2018 | Application (17A740) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 26, 2018. | | | Mar 26 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | Apr 27 2018 | Brief of respondent Tony Mays in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 11 2018 | Reply of petitioner Byron Lewis Black filed. | | Main Document | May 16 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018. | | | Jun 04 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|