Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7825 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7825 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Eric Scott Branch, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:February 20, 2018
Linked with 17A885
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC18-190)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Feb 20 2018Application (17A885) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Concerned Psychiatrists, Psychologists and Neuropsychologists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Response to application from respondent Florida filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Reply of petitioner Eric Branch filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Promise of Justice Initiative filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Application (17A885) referred to the Court.
Feb 22 2018Petition DENIED.
Feb 22 2018Application (17A885) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Billy H. Nolas
    Counsel of Record
Capital Habeas Unit, Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of Florida
227 N. Bronough Street
Ste. 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

billy_nolas@fd.org
8509428818
Party name: Eric Branch
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
Other
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70115

benc@thejusticecenter.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative
David R. Fine
    Counsel of Record
K & L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
18th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

david.fine@klgates.com
(717) 231-4500
Party name: Concerned Psychiatrists, Psychologists and Neuropsychologists

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543