SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7758 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7758 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Eric Scott Branch, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
February 14, 2018
Linked with 17A865
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-1509)
Decision Date:
January 22, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 14 2018
Application (17A865) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Feb 15 2018
Brief amici curiae of Retrired Florida Judges and Jurists filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 16 2018
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 16 2018
Response to application from respondent Florida filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 20 2018
Reply of petitioner Eric Branch filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 22 2018
Application (17A865) referred to the Court.
Feb 22 2018
Petition DENIED.
Feb 22 2018
Application (17A865) denied by the Court.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Billy H. Nolas
Counsel of Record
Capital Habeas Unit
Office of the Federal Public Defender
227 N. Bronough Street, Ste. 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301
billy_nolas@fd.org
850-942-8818
Party name: Eric Branch
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
Other
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Counsel of Record
DLA Piper, LLP (US)
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19109
ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Retrired Florida Judges and Jurists
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##