SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-752
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-752
Vide 17-771
Title:
Pfizer Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rite Aid Corporation, et al.
Docketed:
November 22, 2017
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-4202, 14-4203, 14-4204, 14-4205, 14-4206, 14-4602)
Decision Date:
August 21, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2017)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 13 2017
Waiver of right of respondents American Sales Company, Inc. and Professional Drug Company, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2017
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Main Document
Dec 22 2017
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Feb 20 2018
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 20 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
lefkowitz@kirkland.com
+12124464970
Party name: Pfizer Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Bruce E. Gerstein
Counsel of Record
Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP
88 Pine St
10th Floor
New York, NY 10005
bgerstein@garwingerstein.com
2123980055
Party name: Burlington Drug Company, Inc.; Value Drug Company
Thomas M. Sobol
Counsel of Record
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP
55 Cambridge Parkway
Suite 301
Cambridge, MA 02142
tom@hbsslaw.com
6174823700
Party name: American Sales Company, Inc. and Professional Drug Company, Inc.
Other
Philip S. Goldberg
Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004
pgoldberg@shb.com
202-662-4860
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al.
Richard A. Samp
Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000
rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##