SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7504 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7504 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
William Eugene Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Philip W. Parker, Warden
Docketed:
January 22, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(13-6085)
Decision Date:
August 14, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
October 18, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2018)
Appendix
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Feb 19 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2018.
Mar 22 2018
Brief of respondent Philip Parker in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 05 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jamesa J. Drake
Counsel of Record
Drake Law LLC
P.O. Box 56
Auburn, ME 04212
Jamesa_Drake@hotmail.com
207-330-5105
Party name: William Eugene Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Bradley Moore
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1024 Capitol Center Drive
Suite 200
Frankfort, KY 40601
jason.moore2@ky.gov
502-696-5342
Party name: Philip Parker
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##