Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 17-733
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-733
Title:Murco Wall Products, Inc., Petitioner
Michael D. Galier
Docketed:November 16, 2017
Linked with 17A231
Lower Ct:Court of Civil Appeals of Oklahoma, First Division
   Case Numbers:(114,175; 114,183)
   Decision Date:February 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 19, 2017
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2017Application (17A231) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 17, 2017 to November 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 30 2017Application (17A231) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 16, 2017.
Nov 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Waiver of right of respondent Michael D. Galier to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 08 2017Response Requested. (Due January 8, 2018)
Jan 08 2018Brief of respondent Michael D. Galier in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2018Reply of petitioner Murco Wall Products, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. v. Superior Court of Cal., San Francisco Cty., 582 U. S. ____ (2017).

Attorneys for Petitioner
Evan Mark Tager
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Murco Wall Products, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa White Shirley
    Counsel of Record
Dean, Omar & Branham, LLP
302 N. Market Street, Suite 300
Dallas, TX 75202
Party name: Michael D. Galier


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543