Docket for 17-7306 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 18 2017 | Application (17A446) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Oct 26 2017 | Application (17A446) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 22, 2017. | | | Dec 22 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 5, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2018 to March 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2018. | | | Mar 07 2018 | Brief of respondent Eric Sellers in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2018 | Reply of petitioner Stacey Humphreys filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 22 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018. | | | Apr 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|