Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-719
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-719
Title:Barry Bauer, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al.
Docketed:November 14, 2017
Linked with 17A318
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15428)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2017Application (17A318) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 10, 2017 to November 9, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Sep 21 2017Application (17A318) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 9, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2017)
Dec 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of National African American Gun Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondents Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 31 2018Reply of petitioners Barry Bauer, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Barry Bauer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of California, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 703-2548
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al.
Other
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dhthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: National African American Gun Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543