Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-701
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-701
Title:James W. Richards, IV, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 14, 2017
Linked with 17A338
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0727)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Application (17A338) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2017 to November 10, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Sep 28 2017Application (17A338) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 10, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2017)
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Dec 14 2017Letter of December 7, 2017, from counsel for the petitioner received.
Main Document
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 31 2018Reply of petitioner James W. Richards, IV filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: James W. Richards, IV
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543