Docket for 17-7008
|
Oct 03 2017 | Application (17A398) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2017 to December 23, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | Oct 12 2017 | Application (17A398) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 26, 2017. | | | Dec 01 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Dec 13 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|