SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-698
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-698
Title:
Dustin Buxton, Petitioner
v.
Sandra Kurtinitis, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as President of The Community College of Baltimore County, et al.
Docketed:
November 9, 2017
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-1826)
Decision Date:
July 7, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
August 7, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2017)
Dec 11 2017
Brief of respondents Sandra Kurtinitis, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 22 2017
Reply of petitioner Dustin Buxton filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 27 2017
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Alan Sekulow
Counsel of Record
American Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002
sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: Dustin Buxton
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter S. Saucier
Counsel of Record
Kollman & Saucier, P.A.
The Business Law Building
1823 York Road
Timonium, MD 21093
sauce23@kollmanlaw.com
410-727-4300
Party name: Sandra Kurtinitis, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##