SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-6923 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-6923 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Gerald Parker, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
November 30, 2017
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S076169)
Decision Date:
June 5, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
August 9, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jan 02 2018
Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 18 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey John Gale
Counsel of Record
111 Bank Street
# 303
Grass Valley, CA 95945-6518
jeffgale@comcast.net
530-320-2777
Party name: Gerald Parker
Attorneys for Respondent
Holly D. Wilkens
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
110 West "A" Street
Suite 700
San Diego, CA 92101-0000
holly.wilkens@doj.ca.gov
(619)738-9031
Party name: State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##