Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-690
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-690
Title:Foot Locker, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Geoffrey Osberg
Docketed:November 9, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3602)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Foot Locker, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 04 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2018.
Dec 11 2017Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2018Brief of respondent Geoffrey Osberg in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2018Reply of petitioners Foot Locker, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 26 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Geoffrey Osberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Amir C. Tayrani
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

atayrani@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Foot Locker, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Julia Penny Clark
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff and Kaiser, PLLC
805 15th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jpclark@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Geoffrey Osberg
Other
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543