Docket for 17-6819 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 18, 2017) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Nov 28 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2017 to January 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 05 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2018. | | | Jan 17 2018 | Brief of respondent Eric Sellers in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|