Docket for 17-6781 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 21 2017 | Application (17A332) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2017 to November 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Sep 25 2017 | Application (17A332) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 16, 2017. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2017) | | | Dec 14 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2017 to December 24, 2017, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 15 2017 | Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 26, 2017 | | | Jan 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018. | | | Jan 22 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|