Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-663
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-663
Title:The Green Solution Retail, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1281)
   Decision Date:May 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018.
Dec 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2018
Feb 02 2018Brief of respondents United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2018Reply of petitioners Green Solution Retail, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James David Thorburn
    Counsel of Record
5460 S. Quebec St., Ste 310
Greenwood Village, CO 80111

jthorburn@thorburnwalker.com
303-646-3482
Party name: Green Solution Retail, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543