Docket for 17-642
|
Oct 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 1, 2017) | | | Nov 13 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|