Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-631
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-631
Title:In Re Michael C. Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:October 31, 2017
Linked with 17A480
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2017Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due November 30, 2017)
Nov 01 2017Application (17A480) for a stay pending disposition of the petition for a writ of mandamus, submitted to Justice Alito.
Nov 03 2017Application (17A480) denied by Justice Alito.
Nov 30 2017Brief of respondents Plaintiffs in the District Court, Louis Agre, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2017Response to petition for writ of mandamus from respondents Thomas W. Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
(540) 341-8808
Party name: Michael C. Turzai, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark A. Aronchick
    Counsel of Record
Hangley, Aronchick, Segal, Pudlin & Schiller, P.C.
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maronchick@hangley.com
215-568-6200
Party name: Thomas W. Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al.
Thomas H. Geoghegan
    Counsel of Record
Despres, Schwartz & Geoghegan, Ltd.
77 W. Washington St.
Suite 711
Chicago, IL 60602

tgeoghegan@dsgchicago.com
3123722511
Party name: Plaintiffs in the District Court Louis Agre, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543