Docket for 17-6252 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 6, 2017) | | | Nov 02 2017 | Brief of respondent Kansas in opposition filed. | | | Nov 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner Scott D. Cheever filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Dec 11 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|